Manuel Negrete - Manager profile
Personal Details
Name in Home Country / Full Name: | Manuel Negrete Arias |
---|---|
Date of birth/Age: | Mar 11, 1959 (64) |
Place of Birth: | Mexico City |
Citizenship: | Mexico |
Avg. term as coach: | 0.35 Years |
Stats
No information available.
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | Matches | PPM | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
León Caretaker Manager | 08/09 (Oct 14, 2008) | 08/09 (Dec 31, 2008) | 7 | 2.00 | ||
Potros Neza Manager | 04/05 (Jan 1, 2005) | 04/05 (Jun 30, 2005) | 19 | 1.47 |
Transfer history as a player
This page displays all transfers for the selected player. Alongside the date of the transfer, the clubs involved and the transfer fee, it also displays the market value of the player at the time of the transfer.
Season | Date | Left | Joined | MV | Fee | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
96/97 | Jul 1, 1996 | Atlante | Retired | - | - | |||||
95/96 | Jul 1, 1995 | Acapulco | Atlante | - | ? | |||||
94/95 | Jul 1, 1994 | Toros Neza | Acapulco | - | ? | |||||
93/94 | Jul 1, 1993 | Atlante | Toros Neza | - | ? | |||||
92/93 | Jul 1, 1992 | UNAM Pumas | Atlante | - | ? | |||||
91/92 | Jul 1, 1991 | Monterrey | UNAM Pumas | - | ? | |||||
90/91 | Jul 1, 1990 | UNAM Pumas | Monterrey | - | ? | |||||
87/88 | Jul 1, 1987 | Sporting Gijón | UNAM Pumas | - | ? | |||||
86/87 | Jan 1, 1987 | Sporting CP | Sporting Gijón | - | ? | |||||
86/87 | Jul 1, 1986 | UNAM Pumas | Sporting CP | - | ? | |||||
78/79 | Jan 1, 1979 | UNAM Pumas U20 | UNAM Pumas | - | - | |||||
Total transfer fees: | 0 |
ncG1vNJzZmivp6x7tb7Ap6qfnaKirrO302eaqKVfoq6vwcSlZKedl6eytbGOqamonpmhfLW%2BwKKlnqpfboV0gpE%3D
Patria Henriques
Update: 2024-06-06